September 20th

20th September 2021

Multiply up to 4-digits by 1 or 2-digits

  • 745 x 5 = 
  • 429 x 7 = 
  • 3,281 x 4 = 
  • 7,842 x 6 = 
  • 528 x 34 = 
  • 836 x 29 = 
  • 923 x 15 = 
  • 368 x 56 = 


  • 542 x 23 = 2,710         Explain the mistake. 


  • 745 x 5 =  3,725
  • 429 x 7 = 3,003
  • 3,281 x 4 = 13,124
  • 7,842 x 6 = 47,052
  • 528 x 34 = 17,952
  • 836 x 29 = 24,244
  • 923 x 15 = 13,845
  • 368 x 56 = 20,608

Challenge Answer

542 has been multiplied by 3 then by 2, not 20. Correct answer: 12,466